Rene, Sylvain A (CPSO#: 59163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1901 Yonge Street, unit 4
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y6
Phone: (416) 484-0069
Fax: (416) 484-0037
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2299 Dundas Street West, suite 406
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-3511
Fax: (416) 535-5993
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. A. Rene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2011

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 25 Jan 1988 to 20 Jan 1989
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 06 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As from September 15, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sylvain A Rene, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rene to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Rene shall post a sign in his office examination and consulting rooms
                  notifying patients of his visual disability and will have a practice
                  reassessment after September 2017.