Reshetukha, Taras Romanovyc (CPSO#: 95323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Ternopil State Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2196
Fax: (613) 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taras Reshetukha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Reshetukha ( CPSO# 95323 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARAS ROMANOVYC RESHETUKHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RESHETUKHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016