Revah, Giselle (CPSO#: 86656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayala Revah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )
Dr. A. Revah ( CPSO# 68151 )
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-2107


Corporation Name: Dr. Giselle Revah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GISELLE REVAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REVAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014