Rezvani Khorassani, Massoud (CPSO#: 74461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Hamadan Medical School, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding BLVD West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10323 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-4632
Fax: (905) 237-4642
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massoud Rezvani Khorassani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rezvani Khorassani ( CPSO# 74461 )

Business Address:
10323 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C1
Phone Number: (905) 237-4632

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-9898

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jan 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2002 to 25 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 May 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Massoud Rezvani Khorassani may practice medicine independently in
            Paediatrics, only.