Rhee, Augustine Yeusok (CPSO#: 92433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
100 Queensway Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Augustine Rhee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rhee ( CPSO# 92433 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
100 Queensway Avenue West
Operating Room
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (866) 803-6415

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE YEUSOK RHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2010 to 14 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012