Ricciuto, Daniel Robert (CPSO#: 84798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Room A6 23
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2535
Fax: (905) 721-7796
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T4
Canada
Phone: 905-668-6831 Ext. 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel R. Ricciuto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ricciuto ( CPSO# 84798 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Room A6 23
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT RICCIUTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIUTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010