Rice, George Peter Arthur (CPSO#: 42844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George P.A. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PETER ARTHUR RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2018