Richardson, Katherine Michelle (CPSO#: 88926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Gasparini, Katherine Michelle (used until: 18 Jan 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Richardson ( CPSO# 88926 )

Business Address:
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone Number: (705) 692-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE MICHELLE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010