Richardson, Lisa Ann (CPSO#: 76218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
EN 14-218
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416)340-4800 Ext. 6709
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Richardson ( CPSO# 76218 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Room 8EW-425
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room EN 14-218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008