Risman, Jared Paul (CPSO#: 71238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 224-4757
Fax: (905) 326-8923
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

327 Elgin Mills West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 224-4757
Fax: (905) 326-8923
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jared Risman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Risman ( CPSO# 71238 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 224-4757

Business Address:
327 Elgin Mills West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 224-4757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JARED PAUL RISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002