Rizk, Sarah Zaki Yanni Hanna (CPSO#: 83048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
170 McEwan Road East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 951-6293
Fax: (905) 951-6862
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizk ( CPSO# 83048 )

Business Address:
210 - 170 McEwan Road East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 951-6293

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]


            As  from  January  9,  2017,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Sarah Zaki Yanni
            Hanna Rizk, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given  by Dr. Rizk to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR. SARAH ZAKI YANNI HANNA RIZK
                                             ("Dr. Rizk")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is  Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints  and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS"  means the Drug Program Services Branch, the  Narcotics  Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public  Register"  means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rizk, certificate of registration number 83048, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge that the College investigated complaints bearing
                  File Numbers 99253 and  99247  regarding  allegations  that  I  failed to
                  complete,  in  a  timely  manner,  forms  requested by patients and third
                  parties.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

             (4)  I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to abide by the provisions  of  this  Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (5)   Organizational Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to immediately create an organizational  log
                        documenting all
                  
                        requests  from  patients  and  third  parties  for  documents  (the
                        "Organizational Log"). 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,   undertake  to  record  all  information related to
                        fulfilling documentary requests from patients  and third parties in
                        the Organizational Log including: the name of the  requesting party
                        or parties, the date of the request(s), the date the request(s) was
                        completed  and  the  date this completion was communicated  to  the
                        requesting party or parties.  I  also agree to append a copy of all
                        completed requests to the Organizational Log. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rizk, agree to record information  described in section 5(b)
                        above  in  the  Organizational  Log within 48 hours  of  my  office
                        receiving  or  becoming  aware  of such  information.  I  agree  to
                        maintain the Organizational Log in  this  manner  consistently over
                        time.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor  acceptable to the College (the "Clinical  Supervisor"),
                        for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  acknowledge  that  I  have  reviewed  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking,  attached  hereto  as  Appendix "A", and
                        understand  what  is  required  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor.  The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education  Plan  ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet  with me at my Practice Location,  or  another  location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review my Organizational Log at every meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Maintain  a  log of all patient information reviewed, and, if
                              necessary,  any   patient   charts   reviewed  based  on  the
                              information in the Organizational Log  along with a record of
                              patient identifiers;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the review;
                  
                        (vi)  Make  recommendations  to  me for practice  improvements  and
                              ongoing  professional  development   and   inquire   into  my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform  any  other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews  with  staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deem
                  
                  
                               necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College  at  least  once  every
                              three   (3)  months,  or  more  frequently  if  the  Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Rizk, undertake  to  cooperate  fully  with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my  practice,  conducted  under  the  term of this
                        Undertaking  and  Appendix  "A"  attached,  and  to  abide  by  the
                        recommendations  of  my  Clinical  Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited  to,  any  recommended practice  improvements  and  ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Rizk, undertake  to  ensure  that  Appendix  "A"  to  this
                        Undertaking,  is  signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  undertake  that  if  a  person  who  has  given  an
                        undertaking in Appendix  "A"  to  this  Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling  to  continue  to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving  notice  of  same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly  qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  agree  that  if  I am unable to obtain  a  Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out  under  sections (6)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until  such  time  as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  agree  that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result  of  section (6)(f)  above  this  will  constitute  a  term,
                        condition or  limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition  or  limitation  will  be  included  on  the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to participate in and successfully  complete
                        all  aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix  "B",
                        including   all   of  the  following  professional  education  (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in the following:
                              1.    College Policy #2-12: Third Party Reports;
                              2.    The Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and College
                                    Policies;
                              3.    The CMA Code of Ethics; 
                              4.    Article  in the College publication Dialogue: Preparing
                                    a third party  report?  Here  is what you need to know;
                                    and 
                  
                        (ii)  any  additional  professional  education  recommended  by  my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to provide a 2000-word  written  summary  to
                        the College regarding the Professional Education set out at section
                        (7)(a)  above.  This  shall  include  a  summary  of  the materials
                        reviewed  in  the  individualized  instruction at section (7)(a)(i)
                        above and an explanation as to how the  Professional  Education  is
                        applicable to my practice, and detail any changes to my practice as
                        a  result  of  the  Professional  Education. I acknowledge that the
                        College  will determine, in its sole  discretion,  whether  I  have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rizk,  acknowledge  that a report or reports may be provided
                        to  the  College regarding my  progress  and  compliance  with  the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rizk,  undertake  to complete this requirement within twelve
                        (12) months.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical  Supervision  set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my  practice  ("the  Reassessment")  by  an assessor  or  assessors
                        selected  by the College (the "Assessor(s)").   I  acknowledge  and
                        agree  that   the   Reassessment  will  include  a  review  of  the
                        Organizational Log and  may  also  include  a  chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues  and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary  by the
                        College.
                  
                   (b)  I,  Dr.  Rizk, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations  of  the  Assessor(s)  that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge and agree that  my  Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may  receive  and review the findings of the Assessor(s),  and  may
                        discuss with the  Assessor(s)  any  issues or concerns arising from
                        the  Reassessment.  I also acknowledge  that  the  results  of  the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rizk, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the  Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand  and  agree  that  thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will  consider  my submissions and make a  determination  regarding
                        whether or not the  recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they,  or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice,  and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake that, following  the  decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations  of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr. Rizk, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the  public  register  as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration,  for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any  recommendations  of the  Assessor(s)  which  are  terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice; 
                  
                        (ii)  any  recommendations  of   the   Assessor(s)  which  the  ICR
                              Committee  has  identified  in  its  decision  referenced  in
                              section  (8)(d)  as terms, conditions or  limitations  on  my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake to  inform  the  College  of  each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges at, including,  but not
                        limited   to,   hospital(s),   clinic(s)   and  office(s),  in  any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"),  within five
                        (5)  days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I  further
                        undertake  to  inform  the  College  of  any  and  all new Practice
                        Locations  within  five  (5)  days of commencing practice  at  that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rizk, undertake and agree  that  I  will  submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice  Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  give my irrevocable consent to the College to  make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant  information,  in  order  for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP  consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge  that  all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges,  expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions


                   of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge that I have read and  understand  the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my  right  to do
                  so.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Rizk, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief  of  Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Rizk, acknowledge  that  a  breach  by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act of professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I,  Dr.  Rizk,  acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations 
                  on  my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of  the
                  Code. 
                  
            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Rizk,  acknowledge  that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect,  this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr. Rizk, acknowledge that, in  addition  to  this  Undertaking
                        being   posted  in  accordance  with  section  (16)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr.  Rizk was the subject of a College investigation into two
                              public  complaints  that  she failed to complete, in a timely
                              manner, forms requested by  patients  and third parties. As a
                              result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Rizk will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months. 
                                    Dr. Rizk will engage in professional education in third
                                    party reports, medical ethics and professionalism.
                                    Dr. Rizk's practice will be reassessed  by  an assessor
                                    selected  by  the  College approximately twelve  months
                                    after the completion of the Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Rizk, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional  Education set
                  out  in  section  (7)  above  and  to  all  Clinical  Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:



                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into,  or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance  with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Rizk,  give  my  irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any  information  the  College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Rizk, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out  in  section  (7) above,
                  and  to  all  Clinical  Supervisors,  Chiefs  of Staff and Assessors,  to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant  for the purposes of monitoring my  compliance  with  this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes  to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably  believes  indicates  a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
            Terms, conditions and limitations imposed by Registration Committee, effective
            August 11, 2006:

            1.    Dr. Sarah Zaki Yanni Hanna Rizk is authorized to engage in independent
                  practice.

            2.    Dr. Rizk may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. Rizk is
                  educated and experienced.

            3.    Dr. Rizk may practise medicine in accordance with her Return of Service
                  Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario, and the
                  Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Rizk signed on
                  January 14, 2005.

            4.    Dr. Rizk may also practise medicine in a setting different from that
                  specified in the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement, provided
                  she is in compliance with the terms and conditions of her Return of
                  Service Agreement with the Crown in the Right of the Province of Ontario
                  referred to in clause 2.

Concerns

Source: Complaints Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: January 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sarah Zaki Yanni Hanna Rizk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 9, 2017:

Dr. Rizk was the subject of a College investigation into two public complaints that she failed to complete, in a timely manner, forms requested by patients and third parties. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Rizk will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months.
Dr. Rizk will engage in professional education in third party reports, medical ethics and professionalism.
Dr. Rizk’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately twelve months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision.