Robertson, Deborah Grace (CPSO#: 80529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
5th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 864-5396
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robertson ( CPSO# 80529 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
5th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7460

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH GRACE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2004 to 04 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005