Robillard, Matthew Thomas (CPSO#: 52606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2321
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matt Robillard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robillard ( CPSO# 52606 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Department of Psychiatry - 4E44C
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS ROBILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBILLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1984