Rocci, Adriano (CPSO#: 53710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Main Street East
Lower
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone: (905) 523-6333
Fax: (905) 523-5144
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

595 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J4
Canada
Phone: 9055279264
Fax: 9055212661
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

400 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T4X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 876-3371
Fax: (905) 876-3263
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Rocci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rocci ( CPSO# 53710 )

Business Address:
400 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 4X5
Phone Number: (905) 876-3371

Business Address:
200 Main Street East Lower
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone Number: (905) 523-6333

Business Address:
595 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J4
Phone Number: (905) 527-9264

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANO ROCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1984