Roche-Nagle, Michael Graham (CPSO#: 87355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Eaton Wing North 6th Floor
Room 218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5332
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roche-Nagle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roche-Nagle ( CPSO# 87355 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room 218, Eaton Wing North 6th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5332

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Michael Graham Roche-Nagle may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Vascular Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Roche-Nagle holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Roche-
                  Nagle no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.