Rodrigues, Allison Kathleen (CPSO#: 92917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Adolescent Medicine
1280 Main Street West
HSC 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75658
Fax: 9053087548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodrigues Harvey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rodrigues ( CPSO# 92917 )
Dr. G. Harvey ( CPSO# 92770 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5807

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Adolescent Medicine
1280 Main Street West
HSC 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON KATHLEEN RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015