Rodrigues, Jennifer Claire (CPSO#: 103554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 34055
Fax: 905-521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer C. Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues ( CPSO# 103554)

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER CLAIRE RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015