Rodway-Norman, Mark Tourneur (CPSO#: 60145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: 7053252201 Ext. 6415
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rodway-Norman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodway-Norman ( CPSO# 60145 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK TOURNEUR RODWAY-NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAY-NORMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1990

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: September 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The follow are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College:

Assault on or about July 30, 2018, at the City of Orillia, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge: August 10, 2018
Place of Charges: Orillia, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Active Date: September 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Current Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[July 30, 2018]
1. notify specified officer of any change in his address, employment or occupation;
2. abstain from communicating directly or indirectly with specified persons or from going to specified address except in accordance with the following conditions: one time with police presence;
3. abstain from possessing a firearm and to surrender to specified officer any firearm in his possession and any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling the acquisition or possession of a firearm.