Romsa, Gerhard Jonathan (CPSO#: 69886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Nuclear Medicine
L H S C - U C, Rm C3-207
P O Box 5339
339 Windemere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3433
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

S T E G H
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2122
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario
N4V0A4
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 2026
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romsa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Romsa ( CPSO# 69886 )
Dr. N. Romsa ( CPSO# 71451 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
339 Windermere Road
C3-207 P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3433

Business Address:
St Thomas General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P.O. Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211


Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERHARD JONATHAN ROMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000