Rondilla, F. Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 70625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frederick Street Medical Clinic
385 Frederick Street Suite 16
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 745-7950
Fax: (519) 745-1881
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wilfrid Laurier University
Student Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-1970 Ext. 3146
Fax: (519) 885-4865
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Rondilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rondilla ( CPSO# 70625 )

Business Address:
Frederick Street Medical Clinic
385 Frederick Street
Suite 16
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 745-7482

Business Address:
Wilfrid Laurier University
Student Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-3432

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. F. MICHAEL ANTHONY RONDILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RONDILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1998