Rose-Janes, Nancy Gayle (CPSO#: 79297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Group
205 Queen Street East Upper Level
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-7418
Fax: (519) 787-7421
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

450 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus ON  N1M 2Y7
Canada
Phone: 519 843 2400
Fax: 519 843 2200
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

801 St David Street North
Fergus Ontario
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Canada
Phone: 519 787 2940
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: 518 843 2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Rose-Janes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rose-Janes ( CPSO# 79297 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Group
Upper Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY GAYLE ROSE-JANES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE-JANES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017