Rosen, Clifford Alan (CPSO#: 85938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rosen ( CPSO# 85938 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiolgy
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Feb 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Clifford Alan Rosen may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
            only.