Ross, Anatoly Dimitri (CPSO#: 89462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anatoly Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ross ( CPSO# 89462 )

Business Address:
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-4584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANATOLY DIMITRI ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 19 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2009 to 27 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011