Rosset, Jennifer Ellen (CPSO#: 76059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 445-4067
Fax: (416) 445-0206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Rosset Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rosset ( CPSO# 22140 )
Dr. J. Rosset ( CPSO# 76059 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 445-4067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELLEN ROSSET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003