Roszell, Sheri Lee (CPSO#: 72362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: (519) 352-3210
Fax: (519) 352-2176
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
P O Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: (519) 436-2576
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI LEE ROSZELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSZELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Jun 1998 to 22 Jul 1998
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999