Roth, Lee Stuart (CPSO#: 82666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (647) 933-9480
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

470 Chrysler Drive, Units 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 301
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (647) 933-9480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Roth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth ( CPSO# 82666 )

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-3933

Business Address:
Suite 11-15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Suite 301
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (647) 933-9480

Business Address:
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
Suite 117A
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE STUART ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009