Rowley, Christopher John (CPSO#: 72508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
178 Main Street North
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L0
Phone: (519) 509-2100
Fax: (519) 509-2102
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Rowley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rowley ( CPSO# 72508 )

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
PO Box 400
178 Main Street North
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 509-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN ROWLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000