Roy, Anita (CPSO#: 83321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sinclair Medical Centre
Suite 106
99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone: (905) 877-9998
Fax: (905) 877-8994
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Health Center
101- 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Canada
Phone: 905-272-0165
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Roy ( CPSO# 83321 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Health Centre
101 - 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Phone Number: (905) 272-0165

Business Address:
Sinclair Medical Centre
106 - 99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 877-9968

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014