Roy, Nathalie Angie Louise (CPSO#: 73489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
407 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1W8
Phone: (705) 671-3001
Fax: (705) 671-3003
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathalie Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Roy ( CPSO# 73489 )

Business Address:
407 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 671-3001

Business Address:
1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6
Phone Number: (705) 524-7954

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE ANGIE LOUISE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001