Rumbolt, Danielle Renee (CPSO#: 93048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775


Corporation Name: Rumbolt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
St. Mary's of the Lake Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
KMI Clinic
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
KMI Clinic
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 439-8775

Business Address:
Ongwanada Resource Centre
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A9
Phone Number: (613) 548-1117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE RENEE RUMBOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUMBOLT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2016