Rush, Carolina Ana Estefania (CPSO#: 84064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Tucuman, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
501 Smyth Road
Box 606
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8532 Ext. 0
Fax: (613) 739-6631
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Loiuse street
Winchester
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422 Ext. 6318
Fax: 6137747206
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolina Rush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rush ( CPSO# 84064 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
Suite 4100
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8532

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINA ANA ESTEFANIA RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 06 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014