Russek, Sheila Lynn (CPSO#: 92831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Russek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Russek ( CPSO# 92831 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA LYNN RUSSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013