Ruszkowski, Alexandra Dorota (CPSO#: 74149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4920
Fax: (905) 721-6616
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francis Marrocco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Marrocco ( CPSO# 51039 )
Dr. A. Ruszkowski ( CPSO# 74149 )

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA DOROTA RUSZKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSZKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999