Saad, Samy Mikhail Soliman (CPSO#: 80383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 1700
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa General Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stuoffville Hospital
381 Church St,
PO BOX1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samy Mikhail Saad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saad ( CPSO# 80383 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7570

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMY MIKHAIL SOLIMAN SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2006