Sacchini, Clara (CPSO#: 96829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University Of Parma, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Karma Clinic
400 - 18 Pine St
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 570-0090
Fax: (519) 570-3202
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dep. of Obstetrics & Gynecolo
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73158
Fax: (905) 527-2675
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sacchini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sacchini ( CPSO# 96829 )

Business Address:
Karma Clinic
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0090

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Clara  Sacchini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in obstetrics and
            gynaecology limited to maternal fetal medicine.