Sachar, Seerat (CPSO#: 93199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seerat Sachar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sachar ( CPSO# 93199 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Seerat Sachar may practice medicine independently in Internal Medicine as a
            Hospitalist, only.