Sacks, Eileen Marie (CPSO#: 82539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eileen Sacks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sacks ( CPSO# 82539 )

Business Address:
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone Number: (705) 549-3939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN MARIE SACKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010