Sadek, Amel Henein Fahim (CPSO#: 81889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
6 Clairmont Street
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1
Phone: (905) 680-9703
Fax: (905) 680-9705
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amel Sadek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sadek ( CPSO# 81889 )

Business Address:
Peace Medical Clinic Inc.
Suite 1
6 Clairmont Street
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 938-8064

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMEL HENEIN FAHIM SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2005