Sadiq, Najemus (CPSO#: 81947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6863
Fax: (905) 721-6692
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Sadiq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadiq ( CPSO# 81947 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6863

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJEMUS SADIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 16 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 23 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2006