Saginur, Michael David (CPSO#: 89764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Saginur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saginur ( CPSO# 89764 )

Business Address:
Hospital Montfort
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID SAGINUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGINUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012