Salama, Arielle (CPSO#: 89152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3090
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arielle Salama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salama ( CPSO# 89152 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIELLE SALAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013