Salama, Gamal Moustafa Sayed (CPSO#: 78650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Addiction Treatment Clinics
28 Langstaff Rd E
Thornhill,On
Thornhill ON  L3T 3P8
Phone: (905) 709-9955
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Addiction Treatment Clinics
4972 Dundas st. west
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1B7
Canada
Phone: 4162330404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gamal Salama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Salama ( CPSO# 78650 )

Business Address:
225 Acton Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 4H8
Phone Number: (416) 829-2322

Business Address:
4972 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M9A 1B7
Phone Number: (416) 236-7924

Business Address:
8108 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 709-9955

Business Address:
655 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 5E6
Phone Number: (905) 876-8300

Business Address:
661 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 3V9
Phone Number: (905) 878-8141

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAMAL MOUSTAFA SAYED SALAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 01 May 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 02 May 2003 to 01 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009