Saleem, Asifa Khatoon (CPSO#: 85720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9617
Fax: (905) 336-9638
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asifa Khatoon Saleem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saleem ( CPSO# 85720 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9617

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIFA KHATOON SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009