Salman, Aliya (CPSO#: 76522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 19104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Queensway West
Suite 601
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: 905-281-9898
Fax: 905-281-9143
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2227 South Millway, Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aliya Salman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salman ( CPSO# 76522 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
19-104 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
312 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA SALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006