Saltel, Marc Eric Jonathan (CPSO#: 76260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saltel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2016