Samahin, Ashmal Noel (CPSO#: 24243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ceylon, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto GI Clinic
5 Fairview Mall Drive
suite 450
Toronto
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322 7517
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holly St Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly St Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: (416) 486-7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.N. Samahin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samahin ( CPSO# 24243 )

Business Address:
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 450
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 322-7517

Business Address:
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3L6
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHMAL NOEL SAMAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAHIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1971