Samanta, Tania (CPSO#: 81578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (416) 756-6152
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21400
Fax: (416) 242-1095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shah Samanta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shah ( CPSO# 79466 )
Dr. T. Samanta ( CPSO# 81578 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6625

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6479

Business Address:
402 - 685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA SAMANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMANTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009