Samuel, Christopher Varughese (CPSO#: 90636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church Street, Markham
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Canada
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Samuel ( CPSO# 90636 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER VARUGHESE SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011