Samuel, Daniella Judith (CPSO#: 79576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hosp
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416)242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniella Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Samuel ( CPSO# 79576 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLA JUDITH SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009