Sanaee, Layli Solmaz (CPSO#: 92833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
R Fraser Elliott Building
Ground Floor Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Layli Sanaee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sanaee ( CPSO# 92833 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Ground Floor Room 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAYLI SOLMAZ SANAEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANAEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History